06/29/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/14/2009 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
05/04/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/04/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1222.) | |||
04/23/2009 | From Consent Calendar. To third reading. | |||
04/22/2009 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
04/21/2009 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |||
04/20/2009 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (April 14). | |||
02/27/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | |||
02/26/2009 | Read first time. To print. |