|
06/24/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1629.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 13).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Com. on INS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|