LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB881
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB881
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB881
Compare Versions
AB881 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB881 Enrolled September 8, 2009
AB881 Amended June 25, 2009
AB881 Amended May 7, 2009
AB881 Amended April 28, 2009
AB881 Amended April 13, 2009
AB881 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB881 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB881 Enrolled September 8, 2009
AB881 Amended June 25, 2009
AB881 Amended May 7, 2009
AB881 Amended April 28, 2009
AB881 Amended April 13, 2009
AB881 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare