|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3152.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3161.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2171.)
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1672.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|