|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 7 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 3015.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 2889.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 1963.)
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 1605.)
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 1).
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|