|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 482, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2739.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1843.)
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1365.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|