02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
04/30/2009 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/22/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/23/2009 | Re-referred to Coms. on G.O. and REV. & TAX. | |||
02/23/2009 | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and G.O. | |||
01/06/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 5. | |||
01/05/2009 | Read first time. To print. |