|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 483, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2791.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1978.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 13).
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1851.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|