|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 485, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3290.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2333.)
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1629.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 13).
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|