|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
From inactive file. To second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2010
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Pavley.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1986.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|