|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 489, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 7 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 48. Noes 25. Page 2992.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 10. Page 2008.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 7). Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 28. Page 2066.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 48. Noes 22. Page 1168.)
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|