LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB919
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB919
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB919
Compare Versions
AB919 Amended June 17, 2010
AB919 Amended May 19, 2010
AB919 Amended June 22, 2009
AB919 Amended June 1, 2009
AB919 Amended April 13, 2009
AB919 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB919 Amended June 17, 2010
AB919 Amended May 19, 2010
AB919 Amended June 22, 2009
AB919 Amended June 1, 2009
AB919 Amended April 13, 2009
AB919 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare