|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 376, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 3404.)
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 18. Page 2430.)
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (August 27). (received by desk August 28, 2009 pursuant to JR61(a)(11))
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 1884.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|