|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 219, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 1919.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1448.)
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Com. on APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/07/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 6.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|