|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 128, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1764.)
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (July 8).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1662.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|