|
02/02/2010
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2010
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|