LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB939
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB939
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB939
Compare Versions
AB939 Chaptered September 27, 2010
AB939 Enrolled August 30, 2010
AB939 Amended August 16, 2010
AB939 Amended August 3, 2010
AB939 Amended August 2, 2010
AB939 Amended July 15, 2010
AB939 Amended June 17, 2010
AB939 Amended January 4, 2010
AB939 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB939 Chaptered September 27, 2010
AB939 Enrolled August 30, 2010
AB939 Amended August 16, 2010
AB939 Amended August 3, 2010
AB939 Amended August 2, 2010
AB939 Amended July 15, 2010
AB939 Amended June 17, 2010
AB939 Amended January 4, 2010
AB939 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare