|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 220, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3152.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 67. Noes 9. Page 3182.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 2175.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (August 27).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected August 19.)
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 7. Page 1869.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
01/07/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 6.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|