|
08/27/2009
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 2. Page 1852.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|