|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 377, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 1973.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 17).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 21. Page 1464.)
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|