02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
01/11/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
01/04/2010 | From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Be re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
08/24/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | |||
08/20/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
08/19/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/01/2009 | In committee: Held under submission. | |||
02/23/2009 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
01/07/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 6. | |||
01/06/2009 | Read first time. To print. |