|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 263, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3100.)
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 2124.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1450.)
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|