|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 493, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2792.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1978.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 14). Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1997.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 28). Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (May 12).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|