LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB953
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB953
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB953
Compare Versions
AB953 Chaptered September 27, 2010
AB953 Enrolled August 19, 2010
AB953 Amended July 15, 2010
AB953 Amended June 22, 2010
AB953 Amended June 7, 2010
AB953 Amended January 25, 2010
AB953 Amended January 6, 2010
AB953 Amended April 14, 2009
AB953 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB953 Chaptered September 27, 2010
AB953 Enrolled August 19, 2010
AB953 Amended July 15, 2010
AB953 Amended June 22, 2010
AB953 Amended June 7, 2010
AB953 Amended January 25, 2010
AB953 Amended January 6, 2010
AB953 Amended April 14, 2009
AB953 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare