|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 264, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 7 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2970.) Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 2986.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 2070.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1685.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|