LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB963
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB963
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB963
Compare Versions
AB963 Amended June 30, 2010
AB963 Amended May 25, 2010
AB963 Amended January 25, 2010
AB963 Amended January 13, 2010
AB963 Amended April 28, 2009
AB963 Amended April 2, 2009
AB963 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB963 Amended June 30, 2010
AB963 Amended May 25, 2010
AB963 Amended January 25, 2010
AB963 Amended January 13, 2010
AB963 Amended April 28, 2009
AB963 Amended April 2, 2009
AB963 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare