02/02/2010 | Died on unfinished business file. (Reconsideration pending). | |||
05/05/2009 | January 27-Motion to reconsider continued. | |||
05/04/2009 | Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 51. Noes 16. Page 1215.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Torrico. | |||
04/27/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/23/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22). | |||
04/01/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 1). | |||
03/24/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. | |||
03/23/2009 | Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/27/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | |||
02/26/2009 | Read first time. To print. |