|
07/19/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5919.)
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4099.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 3816.)
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (January 12).
|
|
|
|
01/11/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/07/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 7). From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Re-referred to Com. on RULES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and W.,P. & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|