|
06/14/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 14. Page 3909.)
|
|
|
|
01/26/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 21).
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 12).
|
|
|
|
01/07/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. (Corrected January 11.)
|
|
|
|
01/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Re-referred. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 5).
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. (Corrected May 14.)
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. (Corrected April 22.) Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|