|
09/28/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6558.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 64. Noes 4. Page 6567.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 5. Page 4789.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
From inactive file. To second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Harman.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
From inactive file. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 12. Page 1922.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|