|
07/01/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1767.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS. by unanimous consent, and then be re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and INS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|