|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 354, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 6642.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6562.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 4802.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 29. Page 3911.)
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (January 13).
|
|
|
|
01/07/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 7).
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. Re-referred to Com. on RULES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|