|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 311, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 46. Noes 28. Page 3116.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 2060.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 14).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 820.)
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (March 31).
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
01/08/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 7.
|
|
|
|
01/07/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|