01/06/2009 | Vetoed by Governor. | |||
01/06/2009 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:25 p.m. | |||
12/18/2008 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 47. Noes 27. Page 46.) | |||
12/18/2008 | Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 23.). Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 23.) Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 25.) | |||
12/16/2008 | Withdrawn from committee. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
12/09/2008 | From printer. | |||
12/08/2008 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
12/08/2008 | Read first time. To print. Art. IV, Sec. 8(b) of the Constitution suspended. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 8.) Read second time. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 14.) |