02/20/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2009-10 Second Extraordinary Session. | |||
02/20/2009 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
02/19/2009 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 11 a.m. | |||
02/19/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
02/19/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 44.) | |||
02/15/2009 | Unanimous consent granted to take up without reference to file. Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 6. Page 39.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Florez. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 40.) | |||
02/14/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. Referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file. Read second time. To third reading. | |||
02/14/2009 | Art. IV, Sec. 8(b) of the Constitution suspended. (Ayes 67. Noes 1. Page 43.) Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 45.). Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 29. Page 46.) | |||
02/12/2009 | From printer. | |||
02/11/2009 | Read first time. To print. |