LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ABX31
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ABX31
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ABX31
Action History
01/26/2009
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file. Read second time. To third reading.
01/12/2009
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
01/12/2009
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 0. Page 29.)
01/08/2009
Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
01/07/2009
Referred to Com. on RULES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Read second time and amended.
01/06/2009
From printer.
01/05/2009
Read first time. To print.