10/26/2009 | Died at Desk. | |||
10/26/2009 | Withdrawn from Enrollment. Held at Desk. | |||
07/01/2009 | In Assembly. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. | |||
06/30/2009 | Read third time and amended. Joint Rule 10.5 suspended. Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 200.) | |||
01/26/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file. Read second time. To third reading. | |||
01/12/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
01/12/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 0. Page 38.) | |||
01/08/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
01/07/2009 | Referred to Com. on RULES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Read second time and amended. | |||
01/06/2009 | From printer. | |||
01/05/2009 | Read first time. To print. |