|
03/27/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2009-10 Third Extraordinary Session.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 189.)
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 117.). Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. Joint Rule 10.5 suspended. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 118.)
|
|
|
|
01/26/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file. Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 0. Page 38.)
|
|
|
|
01/08/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
|
|
|
|
01/07/2009
|
Referred to Com. on RULES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2009
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|