|
03/27/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 22, Statutes of 2009-10 Third Extraordinary Session.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 26). Read second time. To third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 125.)
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 25). Read second time. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Reconsideration granted. Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 179.)
|
|
|
|
03/16/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 53. Noes 9. Page 169.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Coto.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 52. Noes 10. Page 166.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Coto. Reconsideration granted. (Page 166.) Read third time and amended. (Ayes 54. Noes 12. Page 167.)
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (March 11).
|
|
|
|
03/10/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/05/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (March 4).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
01/16/2009
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
01/15/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|