|
10/27/2009
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 12. Page 418.)
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (September 10).
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice waived.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 3).
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (August 31).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|