10/27/2009 | From Senate committee without further action. | |||
08/27/2009 | In committee: Held under submission. | |||
08/18/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
07/13/2009 | In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file. | |||
06/29/2009 | Referred to Com. on ED. From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). | |||
06/25/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/25/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 25). Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 271.) | |||
06/24/2009 | Read second time and amended. | |||
06/23/2009 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17). | |||
06/02/2009 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
05/29/2009 | From printer. | |||
05/28/2009 | Read first time. To print. |