09/30/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 27, Statutes of 2009-10 Third Extraordinary Session. | |||
09/30/2009 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
09/18/2009 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:20 p.m. | |||
09/12/2009 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 53. Noes 19. Page 424.) | |||
09/11/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 2. Page 256.) | |||
09/10/2009 | Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. | |||
06/29/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file. Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/28/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/28/2009 | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 47. Noes 28. Page 287.) Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 28. Page 289.) | |||
06/22/2009 | Without reference to committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/19/2009 | From printer. | |||
06/18/2009 | Read first time. To print. |