LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ABX339
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ABX339
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ABX339
Action History
10/27/2009
From Senate committee without further action.
06/28/2009
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
06/28/2009
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 47. Noes 28. Page 281.) Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 31. Page 282.) (Corrected July 21.)
06/22/2009
Without reference to committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. To third reading.
06/19/2009
From printer.
06/18/2009
Read first time. To print.