10/26/2009 | Died at Desk. | |||
10/26/2009 | Withdrawn from Enrollment. Held at Desk. | |||
07/01/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
06/30/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 203.) | |||
06/29/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file. Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/28/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/28/2009 | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 47. Noes 28. Page 299.) Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 28. Page 299.) | |||
06/22/2009 | Without reference to committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/19/2009 | From printer. | |||
06/18/2009 | Read first time. To print. |