LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ABX347
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ABX347
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ABX347
Action History
10/27/2009
Died on Senate third reading file.
07/06/2009
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. To third reading.
07/02/2009
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
07/02/2009
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 2. Page 328.)
07/01/2009
Without reference to committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. To third reading.
06/27/2009
From printer.
06/26/2009
Read first time. To print.