11/05/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2009-10 Third Extraordinary Session. | |||
11/04/2009 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
10/26/2009 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. | |||
10/26/2009 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 51. Noes 22. Page 435.) | |||
10/14/2009 | Read third time and amended. Joint Rule 10.5 suspended. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 265.) Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 265.) | |||
07/06/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. To third reading. | |||
07/02/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
07/02/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 2. Page 331.) | |||
07/01/2009 | Without reference to committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/27/2009 | From printer. | |||
06/26/2009 | Read first time. To print. |