LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ABX413
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ABX413
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ABX413
Action History
07/23/2009
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
07/23/2009
Read third time and amended. Joint Rule 10.5 suspended. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 43.) Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 43.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 55.)
07/15/2009
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file. Read second time. To third reading.
07/09/2009
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
07/09/2009
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 2. Page 27.)
07/06/2009
From printer. Without reference to committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. To third reading.
07/02/2009
Read first time. To print.