07/28/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 17, Statutes of 2009-10 Fourth Extraordinary Session. | |||
07/28/2009 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
07/24/2009 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |||
07/24/2009 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 42. Noes 33. Page 82.) | |||
07/24/2009 | Read third time and amended. Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 15. Page 69.) | |||
07/23/2009 | Joint Rule 10.5 suspended. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 43.) Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 43.) | |||
07/15/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file. Read second time. To third reading. | |||
07/09/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
07/09/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 2. Page 29.) | |||
07/06/2009 | From printer. Without reference to committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. To third reading. | |||
07/02/2009 | Read first time. To print. |