07/28/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2009-10 Fourth Extraordinary Session. | |||
07/28/2009 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
07/24/2009 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |||
07/24/2009 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 55. Noes 18. Page 79.) | |||
07/24/2009 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 6. Page 65.) | |||
07/23/2009 | Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. Joint Rule 10.5 suspended. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 43.) Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 43.) | |||
07/15/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file. Read second time. To third reading. | |||
07/09/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
07/09/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 2. Page 24.) | |||
07/06/2009 | From printer. Without reference to committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. To third reading. | |||
07/02/2009 | Read first time. To print. |