07/28/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 18, Statutes of 2009-10 Fourth Extraordinary Session. | |||
07/28/2009 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
07/24/2009 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |||
07/23/2009 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 70.) | |||
07/23/2009 | Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. Joint Rule 10.5 suspended. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 43.) Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 43.) Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 58.) | |||
07/15/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file. Read second time. To third reading. | |||
07/09/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
07/09/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 2. Page 30.) | |||
07/06/2009 | From printer. Without reference to committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. To third reading. | |||
07/02/2009 | Read first time. To print. |